Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 39 Today
» 838 Yesterday
» 5596 Week
» 16741 Month
» 116526 Year
» 1781902 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #860
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 5396   10/03/1928
O4 6344   26/08/1933
O4 6303   24/08/1935
O4 6251   21/08/1937
O4 5386   16/09/1939
O4 3736   17/10/1947
O4 63649   14/01/1950