Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 293 Today
» 1021 Yesterday
» 4639 Week
» 4639 Month
» 71501 Year
» 1736877 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1135
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1956   11/1918
O4 1737   10/1919
O4 5397   17/07/1930
O4 6204   17/09/1932
O4 5022   05/10/1935
O4 6317   29/01/1938
O4 6590   12/10/1940