Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 22 Today
» 841 Yesterday
» 863 Week
» 14799 Month
» 142242 Year
» 1807618 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1065
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6204   06/03/1937
O4 6585   29/07/1939
O4 6512   03/01/1942
O4 6635   18/03/1944
O4 3800   01/06/1946
O4 63837   18/12/1948