Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 962 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 5454 Week
» 30288 Month
» 64620 Year
» 1729996 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1147
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1652   09/1917
O4 1622   07/1918
O4 6275   31/01/1931
O4 6205   03/06/1933
O4 6299   21/12/1935
O4 6639   28/08/1937