Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 315 Today
» 992 Yesterday
» 5034 Week
» 16179 Month
» 115964 Year
» 1781340 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3318
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6205   02/1938
O4 6229   27/07/1940
O4 6215   20/02/1943
O4 6564   08/12/1945
O4 3750   24/12/1947
O4 63672   05/08/1950