Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 24 Today
» 841 Yesterday
» 865 Week
» 14801 Month
» 142244 Year
» 1807620 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1013
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 2136   09/1919
O4 6208   25/06/1932
O4 6344   17/08/1935
O4 6620   05/06/1937
O4 6611   17/06/1939