Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 435 Today
» 1072 Yesterday
» 7118 Week
» 18164 Month
» 18164 Year
» 1683540 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3335
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6586   02/07/1938
O4 6642   07/09/1940
O4 6274   31/07/1943
O4 6208   08/09/1945
O4 63593   26/06/1948