Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 529 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1437 Week
» 12582 Month
» 112367 Year
» 1777743 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #870
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6361   05/05/1928
O4 6318   21/03/1931
O4 6376   23/09/1933
O4 6286   13/07/1935
O4 6209   01/05/1937