Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 174 Today
» 1096 Yesterday
» 2339 Week
» 2339 Month
» 69201 Year
» 1734577 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1179
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1605   02/1918
O4 6309   27/07/1929
O4 6303   13/06/1931
O4 6210   02/09/1933
O4 6315   29/08/1936
O4 6499   14/01/1939