Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 636 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1544 Week
» 12689 Month
» 112474 Year
» 1777850 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3271
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6610   31/12/1936
O4 6210   08/04/1939
O4 6501   06/06/1942
O4 6619   16/09/1944
O4 3849   14/12/1946
O4 63858   27/11/1948