Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 146 Today
» 1069 Yesterday
» 1215 Week
» 1215 Month
» 68077 Year
» 1733453 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1962
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1686   08/1918
O4 6369   20/07/1929
O4 6552   01/08/1931
O4 6211   09/03/1935
O4 6593   03/07/1937