Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 604 Today
» 1156 Yesterday
» 5075 Week
» 16121 Month
» 16121 Year
» 1681497 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1478
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1212   08/1912
O4 1230   05/10/1918
O4 6363   31/01/1925
O4 6312   18/07/1931
O4 6559   21/10/1933
O4 6270   15/12/1934
O4 6541   15/05/1937