Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 25 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 2951 Week
» 4689 Month
» 132132 Year
» 1797508 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1859
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1226   03/07/1920
O4 6212   25/02/1928
O4 6520   31/05/1930
O4 6311   30/07/1932
O4 6633   05/12/1935
O4 6296   20/11/1937