Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 897 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 5524 Week
» 7262 Month
» 134705 Year
» 1800081 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3329
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6213   30/04/1938
O4 6555   11/05/1940
O4 6289   31/10/1942
O4 6542   22/12/1945
O4 63764   12/06/1948
O4 3807   26/08/1950