Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 52 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 2978 Week
» 4716 Month
» 132159 Year
» 1797535 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #28303
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 100A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O1 63773   07/04/1951
O1 63571   12/09/1953
O1 63808   12/05/1956
O4 63873   27/02/1962