Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 152 Today
» 1096 Yesterday
» 2317 Week
» 2317 Month
» 69179 Year
» 1734555 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #28809
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 100A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O1 63887   16/06/1951
O1 63777   05/09/1953
O1 63650   29/10/1955
O4 63781   19/04/1958
O1 63663   09/06/1962