Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 229 Today
» 1039 Yesterday
» 5760 Week
» 30594 Month
» 64926 Year
» 1730302 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3298
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6217   10/07/1937
O4 6609   15/07/1939
O4 6558   23/11/1940
O4 6351   10/04/1943
O4 6313   27/10/1945
O4 3623   03/07/1948