Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 893 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 5520 Week
» 7258 Month
» 134701 Year
» 1800077 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1188
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1998   02/1919
O4 6355   16/08/1924
O4 6235   19/04/1930
O4 6612   24/01/1933
O4 6307   22/12/1934
O4 6544   19/09/1936
O4 6218   10/04/1943