Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 226 Today
» 841 Yesterday
» 1067 Week
» 15003 Month
» 142446 Year
» 1807822 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3212
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6558   05/10/1935
O4 6229   06/05/1938
O4 5012   07/09/1940
O4 6515   19/09/1942
O4 6218   02/06/1945
O4 3813   01/11/1947