Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 4282 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17688 Week
» 70704 Month
» 190231 Year
» 3217084 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #3228
Pre Grouping Company |
GCR |
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
15 |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
O4 |
6228 |
|
18/01/1936 |
O4 |
6227 |
|
22/01/1938 |
O4 |
6351 |
|
25/01/1941 |
O4 |
6236 |
|
10/04/1943 |
O4 |
3797 |
|
11/10/1947 |
O4 |
63621 |
|
13/05/1950 |
|