Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 638 Today
» 1039 Yesterday
» 6169 Week
» 31003 Month
» 65335 Year
» 1730711 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1485
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1219   10/1912
O4 6308   29/07/1924
O4 5389   25/01/1930
O4 6326   05/08/1932
O4 6241   29/09/1934