Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 117 Today
» 1069 Yesterday
» 1186 Week
» 1186 Month
» 68048 Year
» 1733424 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #487
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 2052   06/1919
O4 6323   19/04/1930
O4 6535   23/07/1932
O4 6584   21/10/1933
O4 6219   07/03/1936
O4 6248   09/04/1938
O4 6226   23/11/1940
O4 6275   20/03/1943