Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 320 Today
» 992 Yesterday
» 5039 Week
» 16184 Month
» 115969 Year
» 1781345 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1247
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1620   07/1918
O4 6264   22/01/1925
O4 6220   09/11/1929
O4 6598   15/07/1932
O4 6538   25/08/1934