Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 749 Today
» 1083 Yesterday
» 5221 Week
» 24122 Month
» 24122 Year
» 1689498 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1118
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6224   03/09/1932
O4 6259   09/08/1935
O4 6630   22/01/1938
O4 5015   08/06/1940
O4 6360   10/07/1943
O4 6576   16/06/1945
O4 3781   12/11/1947
O4 3906   29/07/1950