Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 786 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 786 Week
» 19687 Month
» 19687 Year
» 1685063 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #28353
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 100A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O1 63571   13/10/1951
B1 61049   01/05/1954
B1 61303   24/09/1956
B1 61383   18/12/1958
B1 61080   24/05/1962