Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 647 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 647 Week
» 19548 Month
» 19548 Year
» 1684924 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #28463
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 100A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B1 61320   15/10/1953
B1 61024 ADDAX 28/02/1956
B1 61367   04/09/1958
O1 63571   07/03/1962