Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 38 Today
» 838 Yesterday
» 5595 Week
» 16740 Month
» 116525 Year
» 1781901 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1028
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1916   05/1918
O4 6226   18/02/1928
O4 6508   03/05/1930
O4 6241   19/03/1932
O4 6298   27/10/1934