Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 19 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 2945 Week
» 4683 Month
» 132126 Year
» 1797502 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1068
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6227   02/04/1932
O4 6266   23/03/1935
O4 6606   08/05/1937
O4 6369   04/11/1939
O4 757   27/09/1941