Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 320 Today
» 992 Yesterday
» 5039 Week
» 16184 Month
» 115969 Year
» 1781345 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3229
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 5005   25/01/1936
O4 5022   08/01/1938
O4 5013   01/06/1940
O4 6495   14/08/1943
O4 6227   06/04/1946
O4 63638   02/10/1948