Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 666 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 1682 Week
» 19734 Month
» 252654 Year
» 1918030 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1129
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6246   18/05/1934
O4 6510   07/08/1936
O4 6313   05/11/1938
O4 6291   21/06/1941
O4 6259   24/07/1943
O4 3907   12/06/1946
O4 63574   21/08/1948