Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 89 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 4581 Week
» 29415 Month
» 63747 Year
» 1729123 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1873
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1228   12/02/1921
O4 6331   13/07/1929
O4 6228   23/05/1931
O4 6635   23/12/1933
O4 6252   23/05/1936
O4 752   27/09/1941