Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 314 Today
» 1069 Yesterday
» 1383 Week
» 1383 Month
» 68245 Year
» 1733621 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3214
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6237   02/10/1937
O4 6575   16/12/1939
O4 6228   04/04/1942
O4 6629   16/09/1944
O4 3832   21/06/1947
O4 63821   14/01/1950