Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 930 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 5422 Week
» 30256 Month
» 64588 Year
» 1729964 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1295
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1904   03/1918
O4 6254   18/12/1924
O4 6325   27/08/1929
O4 6230   29/08/1931
O4 6310   17/06/1933