Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 561 Today
» 1156 Yesterday
» 5032 Week
» 16078 Month
» 16078 Year
» 1681454 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #864
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1829   11/1917
O4 6293   12/05/1931
O4 6230   03/06/1933
O4 6630   07/12/1935
O4 6546   24/08/1940
O4 6293   20/02/1943