Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 54 Today
» 1039 Yesterday
» 5585 Week
» 30419 Month
» 64751 Year
» 1730127 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1937
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1664   12/1917
O4 1232   24/09/1921
O4 6291   31/05/1933
O4 6599   08/06/1935
O4 6576   03/07/1937
O4 6333   13/05/1939