Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 119 Today
» 1096 Yesterday
» 2284 Week
» 2284 Month
» 69146 Year
» 1734522 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1302
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1627   09/1918
O4 6270   06/09/1924
O4 6526   19/04/1930
O4 6237   17/12/1932
O4 6578   01/06/1935