Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1585 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19388 Week
» 72404 Month
» 191931 Year
» 3218784 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #1871
Pre Grouping Company |
GCR |
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
15 |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
O4 |
1238 |
|
05/02/1921 |
O4 |
1248 |
|
22/12/1923 |
O4 |
6289 |
|
17/01/1929 |
O4 |
6573 |
|
18/04/1931 |
O4 |
6356 |
|
09/12/1933 |
|