Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 938 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18741 Week
» 71757 Month
» 191284 Year
» 3218137 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #857
Pre Grouping Company |
GCR |
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
15 |
Firebox Type |
Belpaire |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
O4 |
1915 |
|
05/1918 |
O4 |
6250 |
|
10/01/1931 |
O4 |
6239 |
|
06/05/1933 |
O4 |
6352 |
|
05/10/1935 |
O4 |
6547 |
|
17/07/1937 |
O4 |
6565 |
|
12/08/1939 |
O4 |
6301 |
|
06/09/1941 |
|