Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 169 Today
» 1096 Yesterday
» 2334 Week
» 2334 Month
» 69196 Year
» 1734572 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1367
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1700   04/1919
O4 6247   21/03/1925
O4 6277   30/11/1929
O4 6628   05/12/1931
O4 6314   05/07/1934
O4 6349   10/10/1936
O4 6635   31/12/1938
O4 6239   30/08/1941