Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 25 Online
» 701 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 701 Week
» 19602 Month
» 19602 Year
» 1684978 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #117
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6347   09/03/1929
O4 6373   21/03/1931
O4 6331   29/07/1933
O4 5393   17/08/1935
O4 6240   20/11/1937