Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 292 Today
» 992 Yesterday
» 5011 Week
» 16156 Month
» 115941 Year
» 1781317 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #28314
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 100A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O1 63755   28/04/1951
O1 63610   20/06/1953
O1 63590   14/04/1956
O1 63687   20/09/1958