Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 260 Today
» 841 Yesterday
» 1101 Week
» 15037 Month
» 142480 Year
» 1807856 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1200
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1939   08/1918
O4 6303   19/08/1933
O4 6245   31/08/1935
O4 6578   09/10/1937
O4 6277   20/07/1940