Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 901 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 5528 Week
» 7266 Month
» 134709 Year
» 1800085 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #28806
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 100A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O1 63592   03/02/1951
O1 63865   13/09/1952
O1 63795   18/12/1954
O4 63613   29/03/1956
O4 63788   04/08/1962