Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 14 Today
» 1013 Yesterday
» 14 Week
» 18066 Month
» 250986 Year
» 1916362 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3237
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6284   23/05/1936
O4 6290   01/06/1938
O4 6269   09/11/1940
O4 6532   10/04/1943
O4 6246   22/12/1945
O4 63763   21/08/1948