Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 47 Today
» 838 Yesterday
» 5604 Week
» 16749 Month
» 116534 Year
» 1781910 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #822
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6322   10/12/1927
O4 6631   25/03/1933
O4 6583   16/02/1935
O4 6589   29/05/1937
O4 6250   27/06/1942