Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 926 Today
» 1177 Yesterday
» 3232 Week
» 28066 Month
» 62398 Year
» 1727774 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1368
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6357   21/08/1924
O4 6305   02/06/1928
O4 6252   30/08/1930
O4 5385   22/07/1933
O4 5381   25/10/1935