Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 771 Today
» 1095 Yesterday
» 7397 Week
» 32231 Month
» 66563 Year
» 1731939 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #1154
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 1661   12/1917
O4 6365   27/12/1924
O4 5377   21/05/1927
O4 6312   19/10/1929
O4 6637   25/07/1931
O4 6636   07/10/1933
O4 6605   06/10/1934