Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 411 Today
» 872 Yesterday
» 5398 Week
» 13513 Month
» 140956 Year
» 1806332 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #3401
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 6503   15/06/1940
O4 6626   08/08/1942
O4 5012   13/01/1945
O4 3620   01/02/1947
O4 63602   08/04/1950