Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 316 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1224 Week
» 12369 Month
» 112154 Year
» 1777530 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #28311
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 100A
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
B1 61190   28/04/1951
B1 61406   05/12/1952
O4 63602   05/03/1955
O4 63606   01/02/1958
O1 63780   14/10/1961