Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 238 Today
» 1021 Yesterday
» 4584 Week
» 4584 Month
» 71446 Year
» 1736822 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #933
Pre Grouping Company GCR
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 15
Firebox Type Belpaire
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
O4 5388   22/01/1929
O4 5378   09/05/1931
O4 6559   01/12/1934
O4 6569   04/09/1937
O4 6318   20/04/1940
O4 5384   10/10/1942
O4 6620   11/01/1945